Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gregory J. Studerus

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1948 Born
31 May 198032.1Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Feb 202071.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Feb 202071.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena
30 Jun 202072.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Gregory J. Studerus
Father Gregory J. Studerus (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWest Orange, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2020
  • ob/c12: CB, 27 Feb 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 May 2020

Quantcast