Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Walter Flesey

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Allegheny


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1942 Born
31 May 196926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
21 May 200461.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
21 May 200461.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Allegheny
4 Aug 200461.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Allegheny
16 Oct 201775.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Walter Flesey (VIAF: 88873570)
Bishop John Walter Flesey (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,666
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018