Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Arthur Costello

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Choma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1915Born
7 Jun 194126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
17 Nov 196247.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
17 Nov 196247.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Choma
24 Jan 196347.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Choma
22 Sep 197863.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Arthur Costello (VIAF: 9466417)
Bishop Joseph Arthur Costello (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewark

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast