Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Theodore Edgar McCarrick

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned the Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1930 Born
31 May 195827.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
24 May 197746.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
24 May 197746.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
29 Jun 197746.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
19 Nov 198151.3AppointedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
31 Jan 198251.5InstalledBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
30 May 198655.8AppointedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
25 Jul 198656.0InstalledArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
17 Oct 199868.2AppointedSuperior of Turks and Caicos, Antilles
21 Nov 200070.3AppointedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
3 Jan 200170.4InstalledArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
21 Feb 200170.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200170.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
16 May 200675.8RetiredArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Jul 201888.0ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
13 Feb 201988.5Laicized

MicroData Summary for Theodore Edgar McCarrick (VIAF: 16744200)
(Layman) Theodore Edgar McCarrick (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA
Ordained PriestNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA
Ordained BishopNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA

  • a priest for 60.7 years (Laicized)
  • a bishop for 41.6 years (Laicized)
  • a cardinal for 17.4 years (Resigned)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2006
  • r.card: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2018
  • l: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 16 Feb 2019

Quantcast