Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Walter Stanton

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Citium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1897Born
14 Jun 192427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Jun 195760.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Jun 195760.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
24 Sep 195760.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
17 Apr 197275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 Oct 197780.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin Walter Stanton
Bishop Martin Walter Stanton (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast