Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Winand Michael Wigger

Deceased

Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1841Born
10 Jun 186523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
2 Aug 188139.6AppointedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
18 Oct 188139.8Ordained BishopBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
5 Jan 190159.0DiedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Winand Michael Wigger
Bishop Winand Michael Wigger (born , died ) Bishop of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Pro-Cathderal, Newark, Diocese of Newark, New Jersey
Death PlaceSouth Orange, Diocese of Newark, New Jersey

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 419
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017