Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Aurelio Cruz

Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Gaguari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1953 Born
31 May 198026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
9 Jun 200854.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
9 Jun 200854.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaguari
8 Sep 200854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaguari

MicroData Summary for Manuel Aurelio Cruz
Bishop Manuel Aurelio Cruz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Habana, Cuba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2008
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast