Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Aloysius Griffin

Deceased

Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1885Born
15 Aug 191024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
26 Feb 193852.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 May 193852.4Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
18 May 194054.4AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
1 Jan 195064.1DiedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for William Aloysius Griffin (VIAF: 11751425)
Bishop William Aloysius Griffin (born , died ) Bishop of Trenton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElizabeth

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 30
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast