Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Ambrosio de Llanos y Valdés, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1748BornRueda, Spain
1775¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Dec 179143.0AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
3 Jun 179243.4Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
19 Dec 179951.0ResignedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
23 Dec 180153.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
23 Dec 180254.0InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
14 Jun 181566.5DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Ambrosio de Llanos y Valdés:
Bishop Andrés Ambrosio de Llanos y Valdés O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 55
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,914
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 122, Number 645

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015