Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Alba Díaz

Bishop of La Paz en la Baja California Sur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1951 BornMonterrey
31 May 197524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
10 Jun 199544.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
10 Jun 199544.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
25 Jul 199544.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
16 Jun 200150.3AppointedBishop of La Paz en la Baja California Sur, México

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Alba Díaz:
Bishop Miguel Angel Alba Díaz (born ) Bishop of La Paz en la Baja California Sur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,576
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015