Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ruy Rendón Leal

Archbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1953 BornCiudad de Cadereyta de Jiménez
8 Sep 197925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
28 Sep 200551.9AppointedPrelate of El Salto, Durango, México
30 Nov 200552.0Ordained BishopPrelate of El Salto, Durango, México
16 Jul 201157.7AppointedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
26 Apr 201662.4AppointedArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Ruy Rendón Leal
Archbishop Ruy Rendón Leal (born ) Archbishop of Hermosillo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hermosillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2005
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,014
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016