Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Juan de Jésus Herrera y Piña

Deceased

Archbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1865BornValle de Bravo
31 May 188822.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 190741.7AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
17 Nov 190741.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
30 Dec 190742.0InstalledBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
7 Mar 192155.2AppointedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
29 Sep 192155.8InstalledArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
16 Jun 192761.5DiedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for José Juan de Jésus Herrera y Piña:
Archbishop José Juan de Jésus Herrera y Piña (born , died ) Archbishop of Monterrey

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,036
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013