Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María de Jesús Belaunzarán y Ureña, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1772BornMéxico
179623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
19 Oct 183058.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
28 Feb 183159.0AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
17 Jul 183159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
15 Nov 183866.7ResignedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
11 Sep 185785.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José María de Jesús Belaunzarán y Ureña (VIAF: 14627071)
Bishop José María de Jesús Belaunzarán y Ureña O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Linares o Nueva León

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 164, and Page 240
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016