Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Ignacio Sánchez Navarro

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1785Born
13 Nov 180823.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 185166.3DiedBishop-Elect of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
5 Sep 185166.4AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Sánchez Navarro
Father José Ignacio Sánchez Navarro (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Linares o Nueva León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaltillo

  • a priest for 42.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 344
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast