Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Armando Pérez Talamantes

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Titular Bishop of Auzegera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1970 BornSanta Catarina
12 Jan 199726.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
15 Aug 199726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
22 Mar 201443.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
22 Mar 201443.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
13 Jun 201443.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzegera

MicroData Summary for Juan Armando Pérez Talamantes:
Bishop Juan Armando Pérez Talamantes (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014
  • od: Website of the Diocese, 22 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Mar 2014
  • c34: CB, 13 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Jun 2014