Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Mario Pérez Villarreal

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Bennefa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1970 Born
9 Jan 199928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
25 Jan 202049.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
25 Jan 202049.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bennefa
19 Mar 202050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bennefa

MicroData Summary for Héctor Mario Pérez Villarreal (VIAF: 23151836550920402926)
Bishop Héctor Mario Pérez Villarreal (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2020
  • ln/ob/c2: CB, 25 Jan 2020
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast