Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador de Apodaca y Loreto

Deceased

Bishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1769Born
27 Apr 179424.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 184373.0AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
24 Sep 184373.7Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
11 Jan 184474.0InstalledBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
15 Jun 184474.4DiedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Salvador de Apodaca y Loreto (VIAF: 31355092)
Bishop Salvador de Apodaca y Loreto (born , died ) Bishop of Linares o Nueva León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 240
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast