Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilario González García

Bishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1965 Born
15 Aug 199530.1Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
19 Nov 201449.4AppointedBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
22 Jan 201549.5Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
21 Nov 202055.4AppointedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for Hilario González García
Bishop Hilario González García (born ) Bishop of Saltillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León
Ordained BishopAtrium, Cathedral, Linares, Diocese of Linares, Nuevo León

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saltillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 19 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,355
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Nov 2020

Quantcast