Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Primo Feliciano Marín y Porras, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1755BornTamarón, Spain
20 Jul 180146.1AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
12 Sep 180247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
24 Mar 180347.7InstalledBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
12 Nov 181560.4DiedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Primo Feliciano Marín y Porras:
Bishop Primo Feliciano Marín y Porras O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Linares o Nueva León

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 56
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,218
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 240
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 122, Number 646

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015