Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Alberto Cavazos Arizpe

Bishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1962 BornMonterrey
31 May 198926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
7 Jan 200946.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
7 Jan 200946.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Isola
26 Mar 200946.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isola
7 Feb 201249.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
5 Dec 201250.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
29 Jul 201552.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México
13 Jan 201653.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México
2 Apr 201653.6AppointedBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
20 May 201653.8InstalledBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Jorge Alberto Cavazos Arizpe
Bishop Jorge Alberto Cavazos Arizpe (born ) Bishop of San Juan de los Lagos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Juan de los Lagos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,080
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016