Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Jesús Hinojosa Berrones

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1924Born
9 Oct 194925.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 197449.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México
5 Apr 197449.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México
10 Apr 198560.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
2 Feb 200075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
23 Feb 201792.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Jesús Hinojosa Berrones
Bishop Alfonso de Jesús Hinojosa Berrones (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Victoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Feb 2017