Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Gerardo Miranda Guardiola

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Titular Bishop of Idicra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1966 Born
14 Aug 199731.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
15 Aug 199832.1Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
22 Mar 201447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
22 Mar 201447.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Idicra
13 Jun 201447.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idicra

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Gerardo Miranda Guardiola (VIAF: 306386162)
Bishop Alfonso Gerardo Miranda Guardiola (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014
  • od: Website of the Diocese, 22 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Mar 2014
  • c34: CB, 13 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017