Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saltillo

Dioecesis Saltillensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 June 1891
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Monterrey
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Coahuila
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 72,492 (28,000 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noreste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdesaltillo.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Hidalgo Sur 166, Apartado 25, 25000 Saltillo, Coah., México
  • Telephone: (844)412-37-17
  • Fax: 414-92-67

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 June 1891ErectedDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Diocese of Saltillo (erected)
19 June 1957Territory LostDiocese of Saltillo Diocese of Torreón (erected)
8 January 2003Territory LostDiocese of Saltillo Diocese of Piedras Negras (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1948430,000435,00098.9%2721488,9582614830ap1951
1966536,000560,00095.7%7126975,5254122035ap1967
1970711,000748,39495.0%6629957,4844428837ap1971
1976760,000844,19990.0%69341037,3785428147ap1977
1980975,0001,075,00090.7%73341079,1125829450ap1981
19901,100,0001,250,00088.0%92311238,94316135056ap1991
19991,436,8001,632,72588.0%139321718,40225541968ap2000
20001,480,0001,682,00088.0%132371698,7576434371ap2001
20011,322,8151,521,04687.0%143381817,3085336571ap2002
20021,347,3431,566,67786.0%148371857,2826433877ap2003
2003925,0001,064,63786.9%117331506,16615431753ap2004
2004524,987546,57696.1%107341413,72316131127ap2005
20101,173,1501,304,00090.0%121481696,94117526560ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 4 Jun 2013