Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago de los Santos Garza Zambrano

Deceased

Archbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1837Born
4 Nov 186023.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 189355.2AppointedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
9 Apr 189355.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
19 Jun 189355.6InstalledBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
12 Feb 189860.2AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
7 May 189860.5InstalledBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
2 Mar 190062.3AppointedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
19 Apr 190062.4InstalledArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
25 Feb 190769.3DiedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Santiago de los Santos Garza Zambrano
Archbishop Santiago de los Santos Garza Zambrano (born , died ) Archbishop of Linares o Nueva León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey, Archdiocese of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León
Ordained BishopMonterrey, Archdiocese of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 344, and Page 494
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017