Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Sánchez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antonio de Jesús de Sacedón)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1725BornSacedón de Alcarria, Spain
28 Sep 177853.3AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
18 Apr 177953.9Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
22 Nov 177954.5InstalledBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
27 Dec 177954.6DiedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Sánchez:
Bishop Juan Antonio Sánchez O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Linares o Nueva León

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,900
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 95, Number 488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013