Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Guadalupe Galván Galindo

Bishop Emeritus of Torreón, Coahuila, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1941 Born
29 Jun 196523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
8 Jul 199452.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
10 Aug 199452.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
12 Oct 200059.1AppointedBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México
9 Sep 201776.0RetiredBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for José Guadalupe Galván Galindo
Bishop José Guadalupe Galván Galindo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Torreón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCadereyta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad Valles, Diocese of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Torreón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,357
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast