Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Milwaukee

Archidioecesis Milvauchiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jerome Edward Listecki, Archbishop
  • Donald Joseph Hying, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Rembert George Weakland, O.S.B., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Richard John Sklba, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 February 1875
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Wisconsin
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 12,323 (4,758 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VII (IL, IN, WI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: MIL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archmil.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 07912, 3501 South Lake Drive, Milwaukee, WI 53207-0912
  • Telephone: (414)769-3300
  • Fax: 769-3408

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Milwaukee
28 November 1843ErectedDiocese of Detroit Diocese of Milwaukee (erected)
19 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of Dubuque
Diocese of Milwaukee
Diocese of Saint Paul (erected)
3 March 1868Territory LostDiocese of Milwaukee Diocese of Green Bay (erected)
3 March 1868Territory LostDiocese of Milwaukee Diocese of La Crosse (erected)
Archdiocese of Milwaukee
12 February 1875ElevatedDiocese of Milwaukee Archdiocese of Milwaukee
22 December 1945Territory LostDiocese of Green Bay
Diocese of La Crosse
Archdiocese of Milwaukee
Diocese of Madison (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Milwaukee
1950421,3081,435,34529.4%5853449294534624,182262ap1951
1966691,8511,937,80035.7%6974441,1416065214,621291ap1967
1970687,8051,985,60034.6%6145361,1505987733,855264ap1971
1976699,1452,006,30434.8%6375191,156604319603,929265ap1977
1980713,0002,057,00034.7%6154651,080660897363,673266ap1981
1990624,8912,046,24530.5%5034019046911345232,771287ap1991
1999695,9342,197,93931.7%465344809860171813,670254ap2000
2000672,3342,199,06630.6%4223047269261734742,847250ap2001
2001685,0042,222,36430.8%4202937139601644622,764236ap2002
2002689,5192,236,28330.8%4192917109711765172,683227ap2003
2003694,5082,248,78530.9%4013017029891804562,601224ap2004
2004731,5162,261,39732.3%3993457449831524932,290219ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013