Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roman Richard Atkielski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Stobi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1898Born
30 May 193132.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
2 Aug 194748.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
2 Aug 194748.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Stobi
28 Aug 194749.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stobi
30 Jun 196970.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Roman Richard Atkielski
Bishop Roman Richard Atkielski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast