Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David John Malloy

Bishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1956 Born
1 Jul 198327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
20 Mar 201256.1AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
14 May 201256.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for David John Malloy
Bishop David John Malloy (born ) Bishop of Rockford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2012
  • c1: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob: CB, 23 Mar 2012
  • c2+: CB, 4 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,436
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018