Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Francis Schinner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA

Titular Bishop of Sala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1863Born
7 Mar 188622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
13 May 190542.0AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jul 190542.2Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
15 Jan 191450.7ResignedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
18 Mar 191450.8AppointedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
18 Apr 191450.9InstalledBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
17 Dec 192562.6ResignedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
17 Dec 192562.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sala
7 Feb 193773.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Augustine Francis Schinner
Bishop Augustine Francis Schinner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Spokane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 39
  • r: CB, 18 Jun 2013
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018