Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent James Ryan

Deceased

Bishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1884Born
7 Jun 191227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
19 Mar 194055.7AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
28 May 194055.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
10 Nov 195167.3DiedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent James Ryan
Bishop Vincent James Ryan (born , died ) Bishop of Bismarck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArlington, WI

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast