Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frederick Francis Xavier Katzer

Deceased

Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1844Born
21 Dec 186622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
13 Jul 188642.4AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
21 Sep 188642.6Ordained BishopBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
30 Jan 189146.9AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
20 Jul 190359.4DiedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Frederick Francis Xavier Katzer (VIAF: 43957514)
Archbishop Frederick Francis Xavier Katzer (born , died ) Archbishop of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbensee, Diocese of Linz, Austria
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Green Bay, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 385, and Page 520
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017