Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Martin Henni

Deceased

Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1805BornMisanenga, Switzerland
2 Feb 182923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
28 Nov 184338.5AppointedBishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
19 Mar 184438.8Ordained BishopBishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
12 Feb 187569.7AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
7 Sep 188176.2DiedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for John Martin Henni:
Archbishop John Martin Henni (born , died ) Archbishop of Milwaukee

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013