Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kilian Casper Flasch

Deceased

Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1837Born
18 Jun 185921.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
16 Dec 185922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
14 Jun 188143.9AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
24 Aug 188144.1Ordained BishopBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
1 Sep 188144.1InstalledBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
3 Aug 189154.0DiedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Kilian Casper Flasch (VIAF: 122762283)
Bishop Kilian Casper Flasch (born , died ) Bishop of La Crosse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRetzstadt, Diocese of Würzburg, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Francis de Sales, Seminary, Milwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Death PlaceLa Crosse, Diocese of La Crosse, Wisconsin
Buried Place (Original)Chapel, Catholic, Cemetery, La Crosse, Diocese of La Crosse, Wisconsin
Buried Place (Current)St. Joseph the Workman, Cathedral, La Crosse, Diocese of La Crosse, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Dec 2018

Quantcast