Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nathaniel Perry

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Lead


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1948 BornChicago
24 May 197527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
5 May 199850.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
5 May 199850.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lead
29 Jun 199850.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lead

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nathaniel Perry:
Bishop Joseph Nathaniel Perry (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013