Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Patrick Callahan, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1950 BornChicago, IL
11 Aug 197020.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Apr 197726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Oct 200757.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
30 Oct 200757.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
21 Dec 200757.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
11 Jun 201059.9AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
11 Aug 201060.1InstalledBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for William Patrick Callahan:
Bishop William Patrick Callahan O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of La Crosse

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Crosse.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,582
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015