Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Joseph Hying

Bishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1963 Born
20 May 198925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
26 May 201147.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
26 May 201147.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiae
20 Jul 201147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiae
24 Nov 201451.2AppointedBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
6 Jan 201551.3InstalledBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
25 Apr 201955.6AppointedBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jun 201955.8InstalledBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald Joseph Hying
Bishop Donald Joseph Hying (born ) Bishop of Madison

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWest Allis, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Ordained BishopSaint John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Milwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Madison.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2011
  • ob/c1+: CB, 28 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,117
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2019
  • i: CB, 25 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Apr 2019

Quantcast