Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Joseph Brust

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Suelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1916Born
30 May 194226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
22 Aug 196953.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
22 Aug 196953.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Suelli
16 Oct 196953.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suelli
16 Apr 199175.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
31 Jan 199579.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Joseph Brust
Bishop Leo Joseph Brust (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Francis, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Ordained PriestMilwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast