Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rembert George Weakland, O.S.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1927 Born
23 Sep 194619.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 195124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Sep 196740.4AppointedAbbot Primate of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 197750.4AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
8 Nov 197750.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
24 May 200275.1RetiredArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Rembert George Weakland
Archbishop Rembert George Weakland O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatton, PA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Milwaukee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017