Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Heiss

Deceased

Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1818BornPfahldorf, Germany
18 Oct 184022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
3 Mar 186849.9AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
6 Sep 186850.4Ordained BishopBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
9 Apr 188062.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
9 Apr 188062.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
7 Sep 188163.4SucceededArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
26 Mar 189072.0DiedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Heiss:
Archbishop Michael Heiss (born , died ) Archbishop of Milwaukee

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 77, and Page 231
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 385
  • c1: Sadlier's Catholic Directory, Year 1891, Page 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013