Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse James Schladweiler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1902Born
9 Jun 192926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
28 Nov 195755.3AppointedBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
29 Jan 195855.5Ordained BishopBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
30 Jan 195855.5InstalledBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
23 Dec 197573.4RetiredBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
3 Apr 199693.7DiedBishop Emeritus of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Alphonse James Schladweiler (VIAF: 6213661)
Bishop Alphonse James Schladweiler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of New Ulm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee, WI

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast