Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Kozlowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Titular Bishop of Germia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1860BornTarnˇw, Poland
29 Jun 188726.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 191353.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
12 Nov 191353.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germia
14 Jan 191453.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germia
6 Aug 191554.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Kozlowski:
Bishop Edward Kozlowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1914, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013