Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Joseph Seitz

Bishop of El Paso, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1954 BornMilwaukee, WI
17 May 198026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
11 Mar 201056.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
11 Mar 201056.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cozyla
27 Apr 201056.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cozyla
6 May 201359.3AppointedBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
9 Jul 201359.5InstalledBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Mark Joseph Seitz:
Bishop Mark Joseph Seitz (born ) Bishop of El Paso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of El Paso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,636
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013