Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Edward Cousins

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Milwaukee, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1902BornChicago
23 Apr 192724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
17 Dec 194846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
17 Dec 194846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Forma
7 Mar 194946.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forma
19 May 195249.7AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
18 Dec 195856.3AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
17 Sep 197775.1RetiredArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
14 Sep 198886.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for William Edward Cousins:
Archbishop William Edward Cousins (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milwaukee

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013