Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph John Fox

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1855BornGreen Bay
7 Jun 187923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
27 May 190448.8AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jul 190448.9Ordained BishopBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
7 Nov 191459.2ResignedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
7 Nov 191459.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
14 Mar 191559.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph John Fox:
Bishop Joseph John Fox (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,663
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015