Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastian Gebhard Messmer

Deceased

Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1847BornGoldach, Switzerland
23 Jul 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189144.3AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
27 Mar 189244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
28 Nov 190356.2AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
10 Dec 190356.3InstalledArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
4 Aug 193082.9DiedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Gebhard Messmer:
Archbishop Sebastian Gebhard Messmer (born , died ) Archbishop of Milwaukee

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013