Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Albert Joseph Roger Sankalé

Bishop Emeritus of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1946 BornSaint-Louis du Sénégal
18 Sep 197629.8Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
27 Jun 199851.6AppointedBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
27 Sep 199851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
18 Jun 200457.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nice, France
5 Sep 200457.8InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Nice, France
28 Mar 200558.4SucceededBishop of Nice, France
8 Aug 201366.7ResignedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Albert Joseph Roger Sankalé:
Bishop Louis Albert Joseph Roger Sankalé (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,438
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 7 Mar 2015