Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristoforo Guidalotti Cardinal Ciocchi del Monte

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1484²Born
21 Aug 151733.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
10 Feb 152541.1AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
27 Jun 155066.4AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
20 Oct 155066.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
20 Nov 155167.8Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155167.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
8 Jan 155268.0ResignedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
9 Mar 155672.1AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
27 Oct 156480.8DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Guidalotti Ciocchi del Monte
Cristoforo Guidalotti Cardinal Ciocchi del Monte (born 1484, died ) Bishop of Cagli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo
Death PlaceSant’Angelo in Vado
Buried Place (Original)S. Angelo, Church

  • a cardinal for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 147, and Page 102
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jun 2018

Quantcast