Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne de Puget

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1623AppointedApostolic Administrator of Metz, France
17 Nov 1623SelectedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
4 Dec 1623ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
17 Mar 1624Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
1628²CeasedApostolic Administrator of Metz, France
1643SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
18 Apr 1644ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
11 Jan 1668DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne de Puget
Bishop Étienne de Puget (died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlacePommeuse

  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 172, and Page 234
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,885
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast