Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marc Noël Aveline

Archbishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1958 Born
12 Nov 198324.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Marseille, France
3 Nov 198425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
19 Dec 201354.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
19 Dec 201354.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
26 Jan 201455.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
8 Aug 201960.6AppointedArchbishop of Marseille, France
15 Sep 201960.7InstalledArchbishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marc Noël Aveline (VIAF: 17332016)
Archbishop Jean-Marc Noël Aveline (born ) Archbishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSidi Bel Abbès, Algeria
Ordained DeaconSainte-Colombe, Church, Villejuif, Diocese of Créteil
Ordained PriestSainte-Marie-Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie-Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Marseille.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 19 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,082
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2019
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 May 2021

Quantcast